NY A07405 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - print number 7405a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - print number 7405a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to vintage snowmobile registrations.
Title
Relates to vintage snowmobile registrations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Assembly | print number 7405a |
2020-02-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07947 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION