NY A07401 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions of law relating to certain rental vehicle protections from June 30, 2023 until June 30, 2028.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions of law relating to certain rental vehicle protections from June 30, 2023 until June 30, 2028.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30Assemblysigned chap.163
2023-06-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-01Senate3RD READING CAL.1358
2023-06-01SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7059
2023-05-30SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2023-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-24Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.299
2023-05-24Assemblyrules report cal.299
2023-05-24Assemblyreported
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-19Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S07059 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7401

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback