NY A07400 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - substituted by s6871a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - substituted by s6871a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for taxpayer gifts for Lyme and tick-borne diseases education, research and prevention; establishes the Lyme and tick-borne diseases education, research and prevention fund.
Title
Provides for taxpayer gifts for Lyme and tick-borne diseases education, research and prevention; establishes the Lyme and tick-borne diseases education, research and prevention fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | substituted by s6871a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.127 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.127 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | print number 7400a |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03940 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06871 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.444
S06871 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.444