NY A07399 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - signed chap.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends limitations on the shift between classes of taxable property in the town of Clarkstown, county of Rockland for 2023--2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends limitations on the shift between classes of taxable property in the town of Clarkstown, county of Rockland for 2023--2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-23Assemblysigned chap.310
2023-08-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-05-31SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-31Senate3RD READING CAL.1131
2023-05-31SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7360
2023-05-31SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-05-31Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-05-31Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.418
2023-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.418
2023-05-30Assemblyreported
2023-05-24Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-19Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S07360 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7399

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A7399
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07399&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07399
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07399&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07399&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07399&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A7399#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07399&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback