NY A07399 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an office of the transit riders advocate to receive and resolve complaints affecting mass transit users of facilities of the metropolitan transportation authority.
Title
Establishes an office of the transit riders advocate to receive and resolve complaints affecting mass transit users of facilities of the metropolitan transportation authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06832 (Same As) 2016-02-26 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION