NY A07396 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the availability of technical assistance grants in brownfield site remedial programs; provides that the commissioner of environmental conservation shall provide grants to the New York city community board with jurisdiction over the site or to any not-for-profit corporation exempt from taxation under section 501(c)(3) of the internal revenue code at any site which may be affected by a brownfield site remedial program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the availability of technical assistance grants in brownfield site remedial programs; provides that the commissioner of environmental conservation shall provide grants to the New York city community board with jurisdiction over the site or to any not-for-profit corporation exempt from taxation under section 501(c)(3) of the internal revenue code at any site which may be affected by a brownfield site remedial program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-13Assemblytabled
2024-12-13Assemblyvetoed memo.113
2024-12-02Assemblydelivered to governor
2024-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.1310
2024-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7195B
2024-05-30SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2024-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.168
2024-05-28Assemblyrules report cal.168
2024-05-28Assemblyreported
2024-05-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-05-10Assemblyprint number 7396b
2024-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2023-06-05Assemblyprint number 7396a
2023-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2023-05-19Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S07195 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7396B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A7396
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07396&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07396
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07396&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07396A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07396&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07396B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07396&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07396&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07396&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07396&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A7396#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback