NY A07396 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - signed chap.450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - signed chap.450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Rocky Point Historical Society to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes Rocky Point Historical Society to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.450 |
2013-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1498 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5267 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.264 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.264 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05267 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7396