NY A07395 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to notification of rights of victims of domestic violence in criminal and family court proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to notification of rights of victims of domestic violence in criminal and family court proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.950
2019-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6158
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.315
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-01Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06158 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7395

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07395
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7395#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback