NY A07393 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Assembly | signed chap.258 |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1429 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7070 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.387 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07070 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7393