NY A07392 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to monies received and expenditures made by a party committee or constituted committee.
Title
Relates to monies received and expenditures made by a party committee or constituted committee.
Sponsors
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.284 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.149 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.149 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |