NY A07392 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - signed chap.402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - signed chap.402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any entity licensed to conduct pari-mutuel racing and wagering in NYS to locate any call centers within the state of New York.
Title
Requires any entity licensed to conduct pari-mutuel racing and wagering in NYS to locate any call centers within the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-16 | Senate | signed chap.402 |
2011-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.423 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4876 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.356 |
2011-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S04876 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7392