NY A07388 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - signed chap.606
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - signed chap.606
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms the definition of a veteran serving in the Vietnam war era to newly enacted federal law (H.R. 7105) for veterans who served in-country in the Republic of Vietnam from between February 28, 1961 and May 7, 1975, to any active duty service in the Republic of Vietnam that occurred between November 1, 1955 and May 7, 1975.
Title
Conforms the definition of a veteran serving in the Vietnam war era to newly enacted federal law (H.R. 7105) for veterans who served in-country in the Republic of Vietnam from between February 28, 1961 and May 7, 1975, to any active duty service in the Republic of Vietnam that occurred between November 1, 1955 and May 7, 1975.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-11 | Assembly | signed chap.606 |
2021-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1592 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7124A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.475 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.475 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7388b |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7388a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S06888 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
S07124 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7388B
S07124 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7388B