NY A07387 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - signed chap.433
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - signed chap.433
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of North Hills to file applications for real property tax exemptions with the county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes the village of North Hills to file applications for real property tax exemptions with the county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.433 |
2011-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.875 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5138A |
2011-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.70 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.70 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | print number 7387a |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05138 (Same As) 2011-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7387A