NY A07384 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting the Immanuel Evangelical Lutheran Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Relates to permitting the Immanuel Evangelical Lutheran Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05896 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - referred to real property taxation