NY A07382 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s7067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to refunding bonds to 2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to refunding bonds to 2026.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05Assemblysubstituted by s7067
2023-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.553
2023-06-05Assemblyreported
2023-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-18Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S07067 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.343

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback