NY A07375 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - print number 7375b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - print number 7375b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the model overdose mapping and response act.
Title
Enacts the model overdose mapping and response act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | print number 7375b |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7375a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05128 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES