NY A07366 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - signed chap.426
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Defines the term "first responder in communications"; requires, to the extent practicable, that employers of such first responders provide training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defines the term "first responder in communications"; requires, to the extent practicable, that employers of such first responders provide training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10Senatesigned chap.426
2021-09-10Assemblydelivered to governor
2021-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1711
2021-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7121
2021-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.471
2021-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.471
2021-06-07Assemblyreported
2021-05-25Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-20Assemblyprint number 7366a
2021-05-20Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental employees
2021-05-06Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S07121 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7366A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7366
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07366&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07366
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07366&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07366A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07366&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07366&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07366&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7366#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback