NY A07365 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the inspection of non-fireproof buildings every three years; requires compliance with the New York property maintenance code; requires those dwellings not in compliance with such code at the time of inspection to make repairs or improvements necessary to comply with such standards within six months of such inspection, or a lien shall be placed upon the dwelling.
Title
Requires the inspection of non-fireproof buildings every three years; requires compliance with the New York property maintenance code; requires those dwellings not in compliance with such code at the time of inspection to make repairs or improvements necessary to comply with such standards within six months of such inspection, or a lien shall be placed upon the dwelling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06089 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - referred to housing