NY A07364 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that commercial tenants receive a lease; defines terms within leases; establishes requirements for commercial lease contracts.
Title
Ensures that commercial tenants receive a lease; defines terms within leases; establishes requirements for commercial lease contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-10-27 | Assembly | print number 7364a |
2021-10-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04257 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES