NY A07359 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-23 - signed chap.534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-23 - signed chap.534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the bonding authority of the New York city housing development corporation.
Title
Increases the bonding authority of the New York city housing development corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-23 | Assembly | signed chap.534 |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1394 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6750 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.412 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.412 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06750 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7359