NY A07359 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5335a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5335a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the bridge across the thruway on state route four hundred eighty-one between exit 5W and exit 6, in the town of Dewitt, in the county of Onondaga, as the "Deputy Sheriff Glenn Searles Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates the bridge across the thruway on state route four hundred eighty-one between exit 5W and exit 6, in the town of Dewitt, in the county of Onondaga, as the "Deputy Sheriff Glenn Searles Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5335a |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.666 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | print number 7359a |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05335 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.103