NY A07358 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - substituted by s6293
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that on and after December 31, 2021, the developmental disabilities council consists of eight members to be appointed by the temporary president of the senate, eight members to be appointed by the speaker of the assembly, one member to be appointed by the minority leader of the senate, one member to be appointed by the minority leader of the assembly and fifteen members to be appointed by the governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that on and after December 31, 2021, the developmental disabilities council consists of eight members to be appointed by the temporary president of the senate, eight members to be appointed by the speaker of the assembly, one member to be appointed by the minority leader of the senate, one member to be appointed by the minority leader of the assembly and fifteen members to be appointed by the governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19Assemblysubstituted by s6293
2021-05-13Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.384
2021-05-11Assemblyreported
2021-05-06Assemblyreferred to people with disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S06293 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7358A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback