NY A07357 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a pilot program to create an assistance hotline for individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities and complex behavioral needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a pilot program to create an assistance hotline for individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities and complex behavioral needs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-31SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-05-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-05-31Senate3RD READING CAL.1535
2022-05-31SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6274B
2022-05-23SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2022-05-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2022-05-23Assemblypassed assembly
2022-05-23Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.308
2022-05-23Assemblyrules report cal.308
2022-05-23Assemblyreported
2022-05-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-05-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-05-07Assemblyprint number 7357a
2021-05-07Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to people with disabilities
2021-05-06Assemblyreferred to people with disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S06274 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7357A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7357
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07357&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07357
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07357&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07357A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07357&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07357&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07357&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07357&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7357#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback