NY A07347 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends paid family leave benefits to employees who perform construction, demolition, reconstruction, excavation, rehabilitation, repairs, renovations, alterations, or improvements for multiple employers pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement who shall be eligible for family leave benefits if they were employed for at least twenty-six of the last thirty-nine weeks by any covered employer which is signatory to a collective bargaining agreement.
Title
Extends paid family leave benefits to employees who perform construction, demolition, reconstruction, excavation, rehabilitation, repairs, renovations, alterations, or improvements for multiple employers pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement who shall be eligible for family leave benefits if they were employed for at least twenty-six of the last thirty-nine weeks by any covered employer which is signatory to a collective bargaining agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01489 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES