NY A07343 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a procedure for a people's veto of laws enacted by the legislature.
Title
Establishes a procedure for a people's veto of laws enacted by the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03395 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY