NY A07336 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to prohibit an immediate vote from being called by the governor or acting governor on any budget bills.
Title
Amends the constitution to prohibit an immediate vote from being called by the governor or acting governor on any budget bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05058 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
S08199 (Same As) 2020-07-24 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
S08199 (Same As) 2020-07-24 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY