NY A07334 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows credit unions, savings banks, savings and loan associations and federal savings associations to accept and secure deposits from municipal corporations.
Title
Allows credit unions, savings banks, savings and loan associations and federal savings associations to accept and secure deposits from municipal corporations.
Sponsors
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Sarah Clark [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S00670 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - referred to banks