NY A07333 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - substituted by s4928b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - substituted by s4928b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Queens county with jurisdiction for cases arising from Rikers Island facilities.
Title
Provides Queens county with jurisdiction for cases arising from Rikers Island facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s4928b |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.143 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | print number 7333b |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7333a |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04928 (Same As) 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.581