NY A07332 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - print number 7332b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing small business tax-deferred savings accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing small business tax-deferred savings accounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03Assemblyprint number 7332b
2020-03-03Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2020-01-23Assemblyprint number 7332a
2020-01-23Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-04-24Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S02412 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2412B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback