NY A07326 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts vaccine registry information from discovery and other process; requires the commissioner of health and the New York City commissioner of health and mental hygiene to develop regulations to protect patient vaccine information from disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts vaccine registry information from discovery and other process; requires the commissioner of health and the New York City commissioner of health and mental hygiene to develop regulations to protect patient vaccine information from disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.676
2021-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.676
2021-06-09Assemblyreported
2021-06-02Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-20Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-05-05Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06541 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7326
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07326&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07326
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07326&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07326&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07326&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07326&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback