NY A07324 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires state agencies to measure, collect, report, and utilize metrics relating to the experience of residents interacting with agencies to improve provision of services to the people of the state, and to provide a biannual report to the governor and legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires state agencies to measure, collect, report, and utilize metrics relating to the experience of residents interacting with agencies to improve provision of services to the people of the state, and to provide a biannual report to the governor and legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-05-17Assemblyprint number 7324b
2024-05-17Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2023-05-24Assemblyprint number 7324a
2023-05-24Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2023-05-17Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S06932 (Same As) 2024-07-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6932A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A7324
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07324&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07324
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07324&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07324A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07324&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07324B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07324&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07324&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback