NY A07323 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to collecting data regarding alternative living arrangements for children who are at a substantial risk of maltreatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to collecting data regarding alternative living arrangements for children who are at a substantial risk of maltreatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-02-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-01-09Assemblyprint number 7323a
2024-01-09Assemblyamend and recommit to children and families
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to children and families
2023-05-17Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S09949 (Same As) 2024-11-20 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback