NY A07307 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proscribes indemnity agreements in motor carrier transportation contracts.
Title
Proscribes indemnity agreements in motor carrier transportation contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | signed chap.405 |
2016-10-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1105 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4173A |
2016-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.675 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | reference changed to judiciary |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04173 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7307