NY A07305 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the effectiveness of the New York state ocean acidification task force from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2024.
Title
Relates to extending the effectiveness of the New York state ocean acidification task force from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |