NY A07302 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s2981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s2981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a firearm violence research institute and a firearm violence research fund.
Title
Creates a firearm violence research institute and a firearm violence research fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s2981 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.605 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02981 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.35