NY A07301 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 7301a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 7301a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to diagnosis, care and treatment of injured employees by certified nurse practitioners.
Title
Relates to diagnosis, care and treatment of injured employees by certified nurse practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Assembly | print number 7301a |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01122 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1122A