NY A07301 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the Catskill region off-track betting corporation to include the five counties comprising the city of New York.
Title
Extends the Catskill region off-track betting corporation to include the five counties comprising the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2012-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.172 |
2012-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1527 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5054A |
2012-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.473 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.473 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | print number 7301b |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2012-06-17 | Assembly | print number 7301a |
2012-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2011-04-29 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S05054 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7301B