NY A07298 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain special assessing units other than cities to adjust their current base proportions; gives special and approved assessing units the authority to tailor their "cap" to local conditions each year, thereby removing the annual uncertainty; relates to adjusted base proportions for assessment rolls; relates to the base proportion in approved assessing units in Nassau county.
Title
Allows certain special assessing units other than cities to adjust their current base proportions; gives special and approved assessing units the authority to tailor their "cap" to local conditions each year, thereby removing the annual uncertainty; relates to adjusted base proportions for assessment rolls; relates to the base proportion in approved assessing units in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-09 | Assembly | print number 7298b |
2018-03-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | committed to real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.511 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.235 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.235 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | print number 7298a |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07606 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - referred to real property taxation