NY A07295 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s4471a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s4471a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification of the expiration of a PILOT agreement to be delivered to the affected tax jurisdiction within two years of the expiration of such agreement or immediately upon early termination.
Title
Requires notification of the expiration of a PILOT agreement to be delivered to the affected tax jurisdiction within two years of the expiration of such agreement or immediately upon early termination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s4471a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.307 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | print number 7295a |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04471 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.708