NY A07293 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to military voters and ballots for election of members of the board of education and school district public library trustees, and the adoption of the annual budget and school district public library budget and referenda.
Title
Relates to military voters and ballots for election of members of the board of education and school district public library trustees, and the adoption of the annual budget and school district public library budget and referenda.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.489 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.164 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7293 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.498 |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5184 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.164 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.164 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05184 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.489