NY A07287 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires an excavator to notify 911 in the event of an electrical short or the escape of gas or hazardous fluids endangering life where damage has resulted to an underground facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires an excavator to notify 911 in the event of an electrical short or the escape of gas or hazardous fluids endangering life where damage has resulted to an underground facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.1189
2019-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5163
2019-05-08SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-05-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-08Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.271
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-04-18Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S05163 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7287

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback