NY A07286 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s7177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s7177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates unconstitutional language relating to the pre-audit of expenditures from the state insurance fund by the state comptroller.
Title
Eliminates unconstitutional language relating to the pre-audit of expenditures from the state insurance fund by the state comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s7177 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.603 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07177 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.89