NY A07283 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the provision of reasonable accommodation in the provision of housing to a person with a disability so as to allow the use of a service animal.
Title
Requires the provision of reasonable accommodation in the provision of housing to a person with a disability so as to allow the use of a service animal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.509 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.249 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |