NY A07281 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the computation of adjusted base proportions for tax assessment rolls.
Title
Relates to the computation of adjusted base proportions for tax assessment rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Senate | signed chap.266 |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4840 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.148 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.148 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-01 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04840 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7281