NY A07279 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the financing of certain stand-alone clinical facilities by the dormitory authority.
Title
Authorizes the financing of certain stand-alone clinical facilities by the dormitory authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.299 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.721 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5294 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.361 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05294 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7279