NY A07275 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s5549c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s5549c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to maintaining the continued viability of the state's existing large-scale, renewable energy resources.
Title
Relates to maintaining the continued viability of the state's existing large-scale, renewable energy resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5549c |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.482 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7275c |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | print number 7275b |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-04-28 | Assembly | print number 7275a |
2017-04-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S05549 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.482