NY A07274 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions reinstating prior approved work permits and waiving requirements as such provisions relate to rebuilding and repairing homes devastated by Hurricane Sandy in the city of New York.
Title
Extends provisions reinstating prior approved work permits and waiving requirements as such provisions relate to rebuilding and repairing homes devastated by Hurricane Sandy in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6258 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.368 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.368 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06258 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.364