NY A07261 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.219
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.219
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.
Title
Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.219 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.280 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7261a |
2019-05-07 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4308A |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.316 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4308a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.280 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.280 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | print number 7261a |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04308 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.219