NY A07259 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6054
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6054
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the time period for the conveyance of lands for the establishment of the Gateway National Recreation Area until June 30, 2023.
Title
Extends the time period for the conveyance of lands for the establishment of the Gateway National Recreation Area until June 30, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s6054 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.602 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06054 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.136