NY A07256 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates certain requirements regarding billing for electric services, such as when corporations shall use an approved demand measuring device, mandating that classifications of service, the account and/or meter number, and the quantity billed be indicated on customers' bills.
Title
Updates certain requirements regarding billing for electric services, such as when corporations shall use an approved demand measuring device, mandating that classifications of service, the account and/or meter number, and the quantity billed be indicated on customers' bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.145 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1300 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1979A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.433 |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 7256a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S01979 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7256A